FL S1818 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the Early Learning Scholarship Program within the Department of Education; providing eligibility criteria for participation in the program; providing for a child's continued eligibility for a specified period; providing program obligations for eligible nonprofit scholarship-funding organizations and for parents and children; providing requirements for the amount and payment of scholarship funds, subject to appropriation, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early Learning Scholarship Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18SenateIntroduced
2022-01-12SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2022-01-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H911 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
H1299 (Similar To) 2022-01-12 - Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee
S710 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Introduced

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100256Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback