FL S1806 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Transportation; Budget -SJ 540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Transportation; Budget -SJ 540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to proof of financial responsibility for rented or leased motor vehicles. Provides lessors and lessees of rented and leased motor vehicles with certain responsibilities relating to the provision and obtaining of liability insurance. Revises who is deemed the owner of a motor vehicle for purposes of determining financial responsibility. Revises applicability of certain provisions relating to financial responsibility of an owner of commercial motor vehicles.
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Transportation; Budget -SJ 540 | |
2011-03-24 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/29/11, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Transportation; Budget -SJ 206 | |
2011-03-04 | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1806 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/1806/BillText/Filed/HTML |