FL S1804 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Renaming the Agricultural Economic Development Program for disaster loans as the Agricultural Economic Development and Disaster Loans Program; transferring administration of the program from the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to the Division of Emergency Management within the Executive Office of the Governor; requiring the division to work with borrowers in evaluating the need to extend loan terms under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Loans for Agricultural Producers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-21SenateCS by Agriculture read 1st time
2019-03-20SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2019-03-19SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-18SenateCS by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/18/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Agriculture; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2019-03-04SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
25265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57082Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback