FL S1778 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 765
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-01 - Ordered enrolled -SJ 765
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to repeal the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act of 2010, etc.
Title
Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act of 2010
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1003 (Y: 76 N: 32 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 765 | |
2012-02-29 | Adopted; YEAS 76 NAYS 32 -HJ 961 | |
2012-02-29 | Substituted for HM 1321 -HJ 961 | |
2012-02-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/12 | |
2012-02-27 | Referred to Calendar -HJ 846 | |
2012-02-08 | In Messages | |
2012-02-07 | Adopted; YEAS 27 NAYS 12 -SJ 323 | |
2012-02-07 | Read 2nd time -SJ 322 | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/07/12 | |
2012-01-26 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 279 | |
2012-01-26 | Favorable by- Banking and Insurance; YEAS 7 NAYS 3 -SJ 279 | |
2012-01-23 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/26/12, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced -SJ 232 | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Banking and Insurance -SJ 232 | |
2012-01-06 | Filed |