FL S1776 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting local governments from regulating vegetable gardens on residential properties except as otherwise provided by law, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vegetable Gardens

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Messages
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-01HouseIn Messages
2018-03-01SenatePassed; YEAS 36 NAYS 1
2018-03-01SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-28SenatePending amendment(s), withdrawn (640054)
2018-02-28SenateAmendment(s) pending (640054)
2018-02-28SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-26SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
2018-02-15SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-15SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-02-06SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-06SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 1
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/06/18, 11:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Rules
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
60471Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback