FL S1750 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Removing a filing fee paid to counties or municipalities under certain circumstances when petitions to contract the boundaries of a community development district are filed with the Florida Land and Water Adjudicatory Commission; specifying requirements for the petition and the referendum; requiring the district to dissolve if a majority of the qualified voters approve the referendum, subject to certain requirements, etc.
Title
Special Districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2017-04-04 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 2 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/03/17, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
189 | 069 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
190 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
190 | 046 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |