FL S1736 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Justice for Victims of Mass Violence Act"; specifying speedy trial periods for persons accused as perpetrators of acts of mass violence; requesting the Supreme Court to adopt certain rules for the cases of persons accused as perpetrators of acts of mass violence concerning speedy trial periods, docketing of capital appeals, habeas proceedings, and screening of postconviction claims; requiring the clerk of the Florida Supreme Court to provide a specified notice to the Governor concerning persons sentenced to death for incidents of mass violence, etc.
Title
Criminal Proceedings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1261 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 710 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
918 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
922 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
924 | 056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1736 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1736/BillText/Filed/HTML |