FL S1734 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing former members of the Florida Retirement System to be reemployed as instructional personnel following 1 calendar month of retirement or termination of participation in the Deferred Retirement Option Program; requiring the State Board of Administration and the Department of Management Services to request a determination letter and private letter ruling from the United States Internal Revenue Service, etc.
Title
Reemployment After Retirement of Instructional Personnel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
121 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
121 | 591 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1734 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1734/BillText/Filed/HTML |