FL S1732 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Florida Jobs Retention Act of 2020"; requiring certain employers that intend to relocate out of state or cease operation to notify the Department of Business and Professional Regulation within a specified period; providing a civil penalty; providing that such employers are ineligible for state grants, loans, or tax benefits for a specified period; requiring the head of each state agency to ensure that certain services are performed by state contractors within the state, etc.
Title
Workforce Retention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
559 | 952 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9522 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9523 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9524 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9525 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1732 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1732/BillText/Filed/HTML |