FL S1732 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9027 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9027 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing and celebrating February 3, 2016, as "Florida Agriculture Day", etc.
Title
Florida Agriculture Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Senate | Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9027 (Adopted) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H9027 (Similar To) 2016-02-03 - Adopted by Publication, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1732 (Adopted)
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1732 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1732/BillText/Filed/HTML |