FL S1728 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-21 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9017 (Adopted), HR 9003 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-21 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9017 (Adopted), HR 9003 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing January 27, 2016, as "International Holocaust Remembrance Day" in Florida, etc.
Title
International Holocaust Remembrance Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9017 (Adopted), HR 9003 (Adopted) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H9003 (Similar To) 2016-03-04 - Adopted by Publication, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 9017 (Adopted), SR 1728 (Adopted)
H9017 (Similar To) 2016-01-26 - Adopted by Publication, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1728 (Adopted), HR 9003 (Adopted)
H9017 (Similar To) 2016-01-26 - Adopted by Publication, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1728 (Adopted), HR 9003 (Adopted)
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1728 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1728/BillText/Filed/HTML |