FL S1720 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing part V of ch. 343, F.S., relating to the Tampa Bay Area Regional Transportation Authority, etc.
Title
Tampa Bay Area Regional Transportation Authority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Appropriations |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
339 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
341 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 90 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 92 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 922 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 94 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 941 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 943 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 944 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 947 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 95 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 96 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 962 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 97 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 975 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 976 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1720 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1720/BillText/Filed/HTML |