FL S1714 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Discontinues policy discounts relating to the Citizens Property Insurance Corporation after a certain date. Directs the corporation to provide coverage to certain excluded residential structures but at rates deemed appropriate by the corporation. Provides that certain residential structures are not eligible for coverage by the corporation after a certain date. Prohibits the corporation from levying certain assessments with respect to a year's deficit until the corporation has first levied a specified surcharge, etc.
Title
Citizens Property Insurance Corporation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-21 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/26/11, 9:45 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered | |
2011-04-20 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/25/11, 1:15 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered | |
2011-04-14 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/15/11, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2011-04-11 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/14/11, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered | |
2011-04-07 | Also referred to Rules -SJ 461 | |
2011-04-05 | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time -SJ 348 | |
2011-04-01 | Now in Budget -SJ 323 | |
2011-03-31 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-29 | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 6 NAYS 4 -SJ 323 | |
2011-03-24 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/29/11, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Budget -SJ 194 | |
2011-03-04 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 0655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 3511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |