FL S1710 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00344; Withdrawn from further consideration -SJ 00344
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00344; Withdrawn from further consideration -SJ 00344
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for market determination of premium cost for health insurance for retirees. Requires cost of continued participation by retirees in insurance plans to be paid by the retiree. Authorizes employers to segregate claims experience of the retiree group from claims experience of active employees. Authorizes separate experience rating of retirees from active employees.
Title
Public Employee Group Health Insurance [EPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Fasano [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Withdrawn from Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00344; Withdrawn from further consideration -SJ 00344 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00117 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-02-04 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1025 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Government Operations Appropriations (CGHC)