FL S1708 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring persons or entities operating restaurants, eating places, markets, or packinghouses to mark beef containing "pink slime" with certain words; authorizing enforcement by the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services and the Department of Business and Professional Regulation; providing criminal penalties, etc.
Title
Labeling of Beef
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | Senate | Died in Agriculture |
2013-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/18/13, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Regulated Industries; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2013-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1375 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
H1377 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
S1706 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Agriculture
H1377 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
S1706 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Agriculture
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1708 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1708/BillText/Filed/HTML |