FL S1706 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "condominium property"; authorizing the Director of the Division of Florida Condominiums, Timeshares, and Mobile Homes to accept certain assurances in lieu of a specified percentage of the sale price; providing that a condominium may be created within a portion of a building or within a multiple parcel building; requiring that a specified statement be included in a contract for the sale of a unit of the condominium, etc.
Title
Condominiums Within a Portion of a Building or Within a Multiple Parcel Building
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2024-02-07 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Rules |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1249 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
H1021 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Ordered enrolled
S1178 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1021
H1021 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Ordered enrolled
S1178 (Similar To) 2024-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1021
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
718 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
718 | 504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |