FL S1698 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a supervisor of elections to submit an election preparation report to the Department of State within a specified time; requiring the department to post the report on its website, etc.
Title
Elections
Sponsors
Sen. Darren Soto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1307 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
100 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 0215 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1698 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1698/BillText/Filed/HTML |