FL S1690 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the employment of persons younger than 21 years of age in adult entertainment establishments; providing criminal penalties; prohibiting the raising of specified arguments as a defense in a prosecution for certain violations, etc.
Title
Human Trafficking
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice | Senate Criminal Justice Committee | Sen. Clay Yarborough [R] | Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2024-02-20 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice read 1st time |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/13/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2024-02-01 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 2 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/30/24, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1379 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Commerce Committee
S796 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7063
H7063 (Similar To) 2024-05-14 - Chapter No. 2024-184
S796 (Similar To) 2024-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7063
H7063 (Similar To) 2024-05-14 - Chapter No. 2024-184
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
562 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
787 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |