FL S1684 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revising provisions relating to the program; providing purposes and program duties including funding and supervising the public hurricane loss projection model; providing additional specification as to how moneys appropriated to the Division of Emergency Management for the program are spent; requiring that the form used by insurers to provide notice of premium discounts and the uniform mitigation verification inspection form be prescribed by the Division of Emergency Management, etc.
Title
Hurricane Loss Mitigation Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Banking and Insurance | |
2012-02-09 | CS by Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time -SJ 487 | |
2012-02-09 | Now in Banking and Insurance -SJ 484 | |
2012-02-08 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2012-02-07 | CS by Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 484 | |
2012-02-02 | On Committee agenda-- Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/07/12, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-31 | On Committee agenda-- Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/01/12, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced -SJ 227 | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Banking and Insurance; Budget -SJ 227 | |
2012-01-06 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 559 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 711 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |