FL S1684 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals provisions relating to the effect of classified licensure on persons holding a chauffeur's license. Repeals provisions for licensure of such persons under the appropriate license classification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver Licenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-04-12 Favorable by- Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 469
2011-04-07 On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 04/12/11, 9:15 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2011-03-10 Referred to Transportation -SJ 190
2011-03-03 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32258Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback