FL S1682 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an honorary designation of a certain transportation facility in a specified county; directing the Department of Transportation to erect suitable markers, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Facility Designations/98 Points of Light Road

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-18SenateIntroduced
2022-01-12SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2022-01-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1469 (Same As) 2022-01-16 - Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback