FL S1682 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that a person with a single conviction of driving while under the influence may seek the court-ordered sealing of a criminal history record related to a subsequent offense, etc.
Title
Sealing of Criminal History Records
Sponsors
Sen. Maria Sachs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1682 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2016/1682/BillText/Filed/HTML |