FL S1680 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Marjory Stoneman Douglas High School Victim Family Compensation Fund Program within the Department of Education; requiring the department to accept and process applications for certain payments; prohibiting the department from paying an applicant until specified requirements are satisfied, etc.
Title
Marjory Stoneman Douglas High School Victim Family Compensation Fund Program
Sponsors
Sen. Lauren Book [D] | Sen. Kevin Rader [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1680 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1680/BillText/Filed/HTML |