FL S1656 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that the reenactment or amendment of a criminal statute operates prospectively and does not affect or abate specified circumstances; providing that a reference to any other chapter, part, section, or subdivision of the Florida Statutes in a criminal statute or a reference within a criminal statute constitutes a general reference under the doctrine of incorporation by reference, etc.
Title
Criminal Statutes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#303 (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#39 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#39 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Chapter No. 2019-63 | |
2019-06-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2019-04-30 | House | CS passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 4 |
2019-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2019-04-26 | House | Received |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/19 |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2019-04-26 | House | In Messages |
2019-04-26 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 1 |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (225308) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-04-03 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 3 NAYS 1 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/01/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/25/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7069 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1656 (Ch. 2019-63)