FL S1626 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Applying certain provisions applicable to all rules other than emergency rules to repromulgated rules; requiring an agency to provide a copy of a regulatory alternative to the Administrative Procedures Committee; requiring emergency rules to be published in the Florida Administrative Code; requiring an agency to provide a copy of any proposal for a lower cost regulatory alternative to the committee within a certain timeframe; requiring an agency to publish a notice of repromulgation in the Florida Administrative Register and file a rule for promulgation with the department within a specified timeframe, etc.
Title
Administrative Procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/24/21, 11:30 am, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Rules |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1145 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
120 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 541 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 5435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
420 | 9075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |