FL S1612 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-103
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - Chapter No. 2010-103
Summary
Deletes the requirement for affidavits in certifications of minority business enterprises. Provides that certifications may be signed electronically.
Title
Office of Supplier Diversity/DMS [GPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Chapter No. 2010-103 | |
2010-05-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-05-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2010-04-28 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 00991 | |
2010-04-28 | Read 3rd time -HJ 01212; CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 1 -HJ 01212 | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 01165; Substituted for CS/HB 1075 -HJ 01165 | |
2010-04-26 | Received -HJ 01107; Referred to Calendar -HJ 01107 | |
2010-04-21 | In Messages | |
2010-04-16 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00629; CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 -SJ 00629 | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00597 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable by- General Government Appropriations; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00524 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- General Government Appropriations, 04/06/10, 3:15 pm, 401-S | |
2010-03-08 | Now in General Government Appropriations -SJ 00183 | |
2010-03-03 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00112; On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/02/10, 10:15 am, 110-S; CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00183; CS read 1st time on 03/03/10 -SJ 00186 | |
2010-02-25 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/02/10, 10:15 am, 110-S | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; General Government Appropriations | |
2010-02-03 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1075 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 1612; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1612 (Ch. 2010-103) -HJ 01165
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=1612&Chamber=Senate&Year=2010 |