FL S1610 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Hurricane Michael Recovery Task Force adjunct to the Division of Emergency Management of the Executive Office of the Governor to make recommendations to the Legislature regarding additional assistance needed in the response to, recovery from, and mitigation of the effects of Hurricane Michael in certain areas; requiring the task force to review the effectiveness of local, state, and federal activities in those areas, as well as the availability of resources and any additional assistance needed, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Mitigation and Response

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-18SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/16/19, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-09SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2019-04-09SenateFavorable by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 04/09/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
42057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57082Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback