FL S1610 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-17 - Introduced
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Hunger-Free Students' Bill of Rights Act"; requiring schools to provide certain information in specified formats relating to free and reduced-price meals; requiring schools to complete an application for free or reduced-price meals on a student's behalf under certain circumstances; requiring a specific liaison to work with the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to ensure certain students receive meals, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Meals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations; Rules
2018-01-05SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H129 (Similar To) 2017-10-24 - Withdrawn prior to introduction

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100224Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback