FL S1610 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifying that the process a county, or an entity formed by the state or a county, takes for appropriating funds received through the RESTORE Act is subject to the open government requirements of specified provisions; requiring a county receiving RESTORE Act funds to post each proposed appropriation of funds received under the act as a line item on its website within a certain timeframe, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Resources and Ecosystems Sustainability, Tourist Opportunities, and Revived Economies (RESTORE) of the Gulf Coast States Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02SenateDied in Community Affairs
2014-03-10SenateIntroduced
2014-03-05SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Commerce and Tourism; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2014-02-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1375 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Government Operations Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37743Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback