FL S1608 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the "Florida Student Intern Employment Act"; providing a tax credit against the corporate income tax for hiring student interns; providing that the tax credit is equal to a specified percentage of the wages paid to the student intern, subject to a cap on the total amount of credit claimable by the business, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporate Tax Credits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2014-03-10SenateIntroduced
2014-03-05SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2014-02-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0615 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220198Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback