FL S1600 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that the application process and the annual certification process for the Black Business Loan Program be separate and distinct processes; requiring the department to consider certain factors when assessing applications; revising eligibility requirements for recipients under the program, etc.
Title
Black Business Loan Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-12 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/11/20, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
288 | 7094 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 7102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |