FL S1598 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adding and revising rights to the Florida Taxpayer's Bill of Rights relating to the administrative review of property assessment determinations; providing that a person who has assumed responsibility for the tax payment on property is considered the taxpayer for the purposes of receiving the tax assessment notice; revising procedures relating to hearing procedures; providing that special magistrates may be compensated only by an hourly wage, etc.
Title
Value Adjustment Boards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1115 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
192 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
192 | 0105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
193 | 461 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1598 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1598/BillText/Filed/HTML |