FL S1584 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a Driver License Reinstatement Days pilot program in certain counties to facilitate reinstatement of suspended driver licenses; providing duties of the clerks of court and the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles, etc.
Title
Suspended Driver Licenses
Sponsors
Senate Transportation Committee | Sen. Christopher Smith [D] | Sen. Geraldine Thompson [D] | Sen. Arthenia Joyner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/18/16, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/11/16, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-28 | Senate | CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | CS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/27/16, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0787 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee