FL S1584 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1277 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1277 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for information contained in the database of payment instrument transactions within the Office of Financial Regulation into which payment instrument transaction information submitted by money services business licensees is maintained; providing for specified access to such information; providing for future review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/Money Services Businesses/Office of Financial Regulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1277 (Ch. | |
2012-02-17 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/22/12, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2012-02-07 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability -SJ 325 | |
2012-02-07 | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 325 | |
2012-02-02 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/07/12, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced -SJ 219 | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 219 | |
2012-01-06 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1584 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1584/BillText/Filed/HTML |