FL S1582 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 915
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 915
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for future expiration of a provision relating to vehicles with apportioned registrations; providing, beginning on a specified date, license plate and cab card requirements for vehicles registered in accordance with the International Registration Plan; specifying the fee for an original or renewal cab card and the trust fund where the fee is deposited; providing for the replacement at no charge of damaged or worn license plates, etc.
Title
Commercial Motor Vehicle Registration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 915 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 915 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/02/22, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H915 (Same As) 2022-05-19 - Chapter No. 2022-128