FL S1582 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing a provision which provides reporting requirements for voting history and statewide voter registration system information, precinct-level election results, and precinct-level book closing statistics, etc.
Title
Elections
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Bean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/13/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Rules |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Filed |