FL S1580 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Marriage Education Committee within the Department of Children and Families; requiring the clerk of each circuit court to post an electronic copy of the guide on the court's website and to distribute printed copies of the guide if they are made available; prohibiting a county court judge or clerk of the circuit court from issuing a marriage license unless he or she is first presented with a statement verifying that both parties have obtained and read the guide or have viewed an electronic presentation containing certain information, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Guide to a Healthy Marriage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-31SenateNow in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2018-01-30SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
2018-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/30/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
2018-01-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1323 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7410307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
74104Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback