FL S1574 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Regulated Industries
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing security officer training classes to be offered online under certain circumstances; requiring the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to establish reporting requirements for verification of training submission, etc.
Title
Licensure of Unarmed Security Guards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Now in Regulated Industries |
2018-01-31 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/29/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/22/18, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Regulated Industries; Rules |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H813 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
493 | 6303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |