FL S1568 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that individuals enrolled in certain preapprenticeship programs are deemed to be employees of the state for purposes of receiving certain medical care under workers' compensation coverage; revising the general duties of the Department of Education with regard to registered apprenticeship and registered preapprenticeship programs; providing that registered apprenticeship or registered preapprenticeship program sponsors are responsible for the selection and training of certain personnel, as approved by the department; revising criteria for apprenticeship occupations, etc.
Title
Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 02/25/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2020-01-29 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/27/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1203 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 4156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4282 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 2616 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 541 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |