FL S1568 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Read 2nd time -SJ 638
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Read 2nd time -SJ 638
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a residential property insurer to renegotiate a note issued by the Insurance Capital Build-Up Incentive Program under certain circumstances. Authorizes the Department of Financial Services to request appointment as ancillary receiver if necessary to obtain records to adjudicate covered claims. Provides for the State Risk Management Trust Fund to cover specified officers, employees, agents, and other representatives of the Department of Financial Services for liability under specified federal laws relating to receiverships, etc.
Title
Insurer Insolvency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Read 2nd time -SJ 638 | |
2011-04-29 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/11 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 541 | |
2011-04-26 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 -SJ 541 | |
2011-04-21 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/26/11, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-04-20 | Now in Rules -SJ 471 | |
2011-04-19 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-04-15 | CS/CS by Budget; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 -SJ 471 | |
2011-04-14 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/15/11, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-04-11 | On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/14/11, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered | |
2011-04-07 | Also referred to Rules -SJ 461 | |
2011-03-24 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-22 | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 286 | |
2011-03-17 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/22/11, 1:15 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-09 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Budget -SJ 176 | |
2011-03-03 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5595 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 424 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
624 | 610 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 152 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 2715 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 391 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 904 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
631 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |