FL S1550 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies criteria for students who are eligible to participate in the program. Identifies certain students who may not participate in the program. Provides that a parent may direct a financial institution trustee of his or her child's account to use the funds for specified costs of attending a private school or participating in a dual enrollment program or to make a contribution to the child's college savings plan or a payment to a contract under the Stanley G. Tate Florida Prepaid College Program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education Savings Account Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-04-14 Favorable by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 3 NAYS 0 -SJ 469
2011-04-11 On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 04/14/11, 9:15 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2011-03-09 Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Higher Education; Budget -SJ 174
2011-03-02 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback