FL S1540 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating the "Florida Jobs Retention Act of 2024"; defining the terms "department" and "employer"; requiring employers that intend to relocate out of state or cease operation to notify the Department of Business and Professional Regulation within a specified timeframe before taking such action; providing that such employers are ineligible for state grants, loans, or tax benefits for a specified timeframe; requiring the head of each state agency to ensure that certain services are performed by state contractors within the state, etc.
Title
Workforce Retention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Tourism (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/23/24, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
559 | 953 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9532 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9533 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9534 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
559 | 9535 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |