FL S1540 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting a provision prohibiting a district school board from awarding an annual contract on the basis of certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Powers and Duties of a District School Board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Education |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Education; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6055 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1540 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1540/BillText/Filed/HTML |