FL S1522 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Implementation of Governor DeSantis' Blue-Green Algae Task Force Recommendations Act"; requiring owners of onsite sewage treatment and disposal systems to have the system periodically inspected, beginning on a specified date; requiring the Department of Health to administer the inspection program; requiring the department to implement program standards, procedures, and requirements; providing for rulemaking; requiring new or revised basin management action plans to include an identification and prioritization of certain spatially focused projects, etc.
Title
Implementation of the Recommendations of the Blue-Green Algae Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Environment and Natural Resources (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/08/21, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/29/21, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1225 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 0065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 067 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |