FL S1520 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising specified prohibited activities involving controlled substances within 1,000 feet of certain schools during their hours of operation; revising specified prohibited activities involving controlled substances during the hours of operation within 1,000 feet of certain parks, community centers, or publicly owned recreational facilities; revising specified prohibited activities involving controlled substances within 1,000 feet of specified places of worship when churches or religious organizations are conducting services or other activities, etc.
Title
Controlled Substances
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Pizzo [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1233 (Similar To) 2023-05-05 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
893 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 149 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |