FL S1514 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Children and Families to establish a certain exemption process and to adopt rules and procedures for the documentation necessary for exempting household members who have disabilities from being fingerprinted before a child is placed in the home; requiring the department to take all the necessary steps to recover financial assistance provided to nonrelative caregivers under certain circumstances; authorizing the court to make certain determinations regarding placement of a child with a guardian, etc.
Title
Child Welfare
Sponsors
Sen. Rene Garcia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1079 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-103
S1360 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1079
H7065 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S590 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1435
H5003 (Similar To) 2018-03-20 - Chapter No. 2018-10
S1360 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1079
H7065 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S590 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1435
H5003 (Similar To) 2018-03-20 - Chapter No. 2018-10
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 0138 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 5085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 6012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 6221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 6225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 6251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 495 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 166 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1676 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1678 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
960 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1514 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1514/BillText/Filed/HTML |