FL S1514 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Redefines the term "alternative water supplies" to exclude the development of nonbrackish groundwater supplies. Requires the Department of Environmental Protection or governing board of a water management district to limit its review following issuance of a consumptive use permit and make only one request for additional information. Provides for the governing board rather than the district to grant permits for certain projects. Extends the term to 10 years from 5 years for submitting compliance reports, etc.
Title
Environmental Regulation
Sponsors
Senate Agriculture Committee | Senate Environmental Preservation and Conservation Committee | Sen. Jack Latvala [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-26 | CS/CS by Agriculture read 1st time -SJ 487 | |
2011-04-14 | Now in Budget -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-13 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-04-11 | CS/CS by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 469 | |
2011-04-06 | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 04/11/11, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2011-04-05 | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time -SJ 346 | |
2011-04-01 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-03-30 | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 323 | |
2011-03-25 | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 03/30/11, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-09 | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Agriculture; Budget -SJ 171 | |
2011-03-02 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
373 | 019 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 2234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 236 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 243 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 41492 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
373 | 707 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |