FL S1510 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Criminal Justice Information Program to submit an annual report to the Federal Bureau of Investigation, etc.
Title
Crime Reports
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Farmer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1510 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2017/1510/BillText/Filed/HTML |