FL S1508 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a physician or osteopathic physician or a clinic owner to register a clinic with the Department of Health if the clinic meets certain criteria; requiring a physician or osteopathic physician to adhere to specified regulations in the performance of any procedure using or purporting to use stem cells or products containing stem cells, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use of Stem Cells in a Clinic Setting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Rules
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-28SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-27SenateFavorable by Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2018-02-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-06SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-06SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/06/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations; Rules
2018-01-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1185 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
458352Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459027Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback