FL S1508 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Conference Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the Division of Dairy Industry within the department. Adds the inspection of dairy farms, milk plants, and milk product plants and other specified functions to the duties of the Division of Food Safety within the department. Provides for the Market Improvements Working Capital Trust Fund within the DOACS to be the depository for funds collected by agricultural marketing facilities, etc.
Title
Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services [WPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Carey Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-06 - House - House Roll Call No. 0689 - Passage (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0007 - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-31 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0007 - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Conference Committee | |
2010-04-19 | Conference Committee appointed: Rivera, Flores, Bullard, Clarke-Reed, Coley, Fresen, Kiar, Legg, Stargel, Proctor, Brise, Burgin, Jones, McKeel, O'Toole, Reed, Glorioso, Gibson, Jenne, Horner, Hukill, Murzin, Rogers, Schenck, Adams, Eisnaugle, Holder, Kreegel, Porth, Rouson, Soto, Tobia, Hays, Abruzzo, Braynon, Gonzalez, Nelson, Ray, Workman, Williams, A., Grimsley, Chestnut, Ford, Frishe, Hudson, Roberson, Y., Skidmore, Thompson, N., Poppell, Bembry, Boyd, Brandenburg, Crisafulli, Plakon, Precourt, Williams, T., Bogdanoff, Aubuchon, Bernard, Carroll, Dorworth, Patronis, Fitzgerald, Thurston, Galvano, Gibbons, Hasner, Lopez-Cantera, Reagan, Sands, Thompson, G., Weatherford, McBurney -HJ 00735 | |
2010-04-16 | Conference Committee appointed: Senators Alexander, Chair; Haridopolos, Vice Chair; Altman, Bennett, Justice, Ring, Storms, At Large; Criminal & Civil Justice: Crist, Chair; Jones, Joyner, Villalobos, Wilson; Education Pre-K-12: Wise, Chair; Bullard, Detert, Garcia, Richter, Siplin; General Government: Baker, Chair; Aronberg, Dean, Lawson, Oelrich; Health & Human Services: Peaden, Chair; Gaetz, Haridopolos, Negron, Rich, Sobel; Higher Education: Lynn, Chair; Constantine, Gelber, Thrasher; Trans & Econ Development: Fasano, Chair; Diaz de la Portilla, Dockery, Gardiner, Hill, Smith -SJ 00648 | |
2010-04-06 | In returning messages | |
2010-04-06 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -HJ 00504; Amendment(s) adopted -HJ 00504; Read 3rd time -HJ 00504; CS passed as amended; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 -HJ 00504; Immediately certified -HJ 00526; Passed the Senate bill as amended by House and we accede to conference -HJ 00526 | |
2010-04-01 | Received -HJ 00472; Referred to Calendar -HJ 00472 | |
2010-03-31 | In Messages | |
2010-03-31 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00383; Read 3rd time -SJ 00384; CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 -SJ 00384; Immediately certified -SJ 00384; Requests House concur or failing to concur appoint conference cmte -SJ 00407 | |
2010-03-26 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00350 | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable by- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; YEAS 23 NAYS 0 -SJ 00349 | |
2010-03-22 | Original reference(s) removed: Rules; Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00307; On Committee agenda-- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, 03/25/10, 1:30 pm, 412-K | |
2010-03-19 | CS by General Government Appropriations; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00280; CS read 1st time on 03/22/10 -SJ 00291; Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-16 | On Committee agenda-- General Government Appropriations, 03/19/10, 8:30 am, 401-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules -SJ 00107 | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; Rules | |
2010-01-27 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0020 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0570 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0570 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0570 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0570 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0570 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0570 | 531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0589 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0589 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |